CA AB2023 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 16001.9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care.
Title
Foster care placement: rights of children.
Sponsors
Asm. Dave Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2012-04-24 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11999 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16001.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |