CA AB2054 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21209 and 21968 of the Vehicle Code, relating to motorized skateboards.
Title
Motorized skateboards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21209 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21968 | Amended Code | Citation Text |