CA AB2061 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Apr 29 @ 2:30 pm in State Capitol, Room 126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 6377.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Sales and Use Tax: exemptions: zero-emission public transportation ferries.
Sponsors
Asm. Lori Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2024-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6377.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |