CA AB21 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 116760.46 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Safe Drinking Water Small Community Emergency Grant Fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] | Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Assembly - AB 21 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB21 Alejo By Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 21 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB21 Alejo By Hill (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Assembly - AB 21 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 628, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3068.). |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2242.). |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and HEALTH. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1658.) |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 24). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (February 12). |
2013-02-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2012-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |