CA AB2102 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 760 of, and to add Sections 759.1 and 763 to, the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to vessels.
Title
For-hire vessels: organized camps: camp vessels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 7. |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Harbors and Navigation Code | 759.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 760 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Harbors and Navigation Code | 763 | New Code | See Bill Text |