CA AB211 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-07 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4658.5 and 4658.6 of, and to add Section 4658.7 to, the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation: permanent disability benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB211 Cedillo By DeSaulnier (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 211 CEDILLO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-07-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - Assembly - AB 211 CEDILLO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-07 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2011-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2011-08-31 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2011-08-30 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2163.). | |
2011-08-29 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-08-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25). | |
2011-07-11 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-06-23 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-06-02 | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-19 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 1459.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-30 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2011-02-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4658.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4658.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 4658.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |