CA AB2112 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 2.7 (commencing with Section 60) to Division 1 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 130202 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Prescription Record Privacy Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-08 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-07 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-03-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. | |
2010-02-19 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |