CA AB2128 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 926.1, 926.2, 926.3, and 12939.2 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurer investments.
Title
Insurer investments: community development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2128 GORDON Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 54 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2128 Gordon By Correa (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2128 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2128 Gordon By Correa (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - AB 2128 GORDON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 6101.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4462.). |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 4474.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 9). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 12939.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 926.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 926.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 926.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |