CA AB2137 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42921, 51225.7, 52062, 52064, and 52068 of the Education Code, relating to homeless and foster youth.
Title
Homeless and foster youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUM. S. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 51225.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52064 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52068 | Amended Code | Citation Text |