CA AB2146 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4599 to the Public Resources Code, relating to forestry and fire protection.
Title
Forestry and fire protection: greenhouse gas emissions.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] | Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] |
Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 4). |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4599 | New Code | See Bill Text |