CA AB2152 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 66014.7 to the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
California State University: University of California: graduation requirements: service learning pilot program.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Bill Essayli [R] | Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66014.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |