CA AB2165 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2827.10 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Net energy metering: eligible fuel cell
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-29 - Assembly - AB 2165 HILL Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2165 Hill By Alquist (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2165 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2165 Hill By Alquist (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 2165 HILL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 603, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-29 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6488.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 19. Page 6561.). | |
2012-08-28 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-08-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4904.). | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-07-05 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). | |
2012-06-25 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (June 11). | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 18. Page 4780.) | |
2012-05-08 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-07 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-24 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-23 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 16). | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2827.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |