CA AB2174 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23320 of, and to add Section 23399.01 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: beer caterer’s permit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 17). |
2024-02-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 23399.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |