CA AB2195 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 898, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 898, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 256, 257, and 258 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.
Title
Juveniles: truancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2195 ACHADJIAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2195 Achadjian By Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Assembly - AB 2195 ACHADJIAN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2195 Achadjian By Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Assembly - AB 2195 ACHADJIAN Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 898, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6087.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4408.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4429.) |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 256 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 257 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 258 | Amended Code | Citation Text |