CA AB2203 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25202 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: beer labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2203 Chesbro By Padilla (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2203 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2203 CHESBRO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 236, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4377.). |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4600.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |