CA AB2206 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 866, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 866, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 43845 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Nonattainment basins: employee parking: parking cash-out program.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2206 Lee By Wieckowski (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2206 Lee Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2206 Lee By Wieckowski (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2206 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2206 Lee Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2206 Lee By Wieckowski (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - AB 2206 Lee Assembly Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 866, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 19.). |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 5234.). |
2022-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on TRANS., JUD. and E.Q. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 15. Page 4609.) |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 18). |
2022-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2022-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43845 | Amended Code | Citation Text |