CA AB2209 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7284.6 of the Government Code, relating to law enforcement.
Title
California Values Act: exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Reconsideration refused. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7284.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |