CA AB2210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23575.3 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Driving under the influence: ignition interlock devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 23575.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |