CA AB2216 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1950.5 of, and to add Section 1940.42 to, the Civil Code, relating to housing.
Title
Tenancy: common household pets.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Haney [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 9). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1940.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1950.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |