CA AB2231 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21300, to add Section 21303.5 to, and to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 21400) to Division 8 of, the Financial Code, relating to pawnbrokers.
Title
Pawnbrokers: education.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and B. & P. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 21300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 21303.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |