CA AB2240 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 36069 and 50710.1 of, to add Sections 36054.5 and 50710.3 to, and to repeal Section 50716 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Farm labor centers: migratory agricultural workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 36054.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 36069 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50710.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50710.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 50716 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |