CA AB2251 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12024.13 to the Business and Professions Code, and to add Section 14536.7 to the Public Resources Code, relating to weights and measures.
Title
Weights and measures: beverage containers: redemption value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - AB 2251 YAMADA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2251 Yamada By Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2251 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2251 Yamada By Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 2251 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 605, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6036.). |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4369.). |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4762.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 12024.13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 14536.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |