CA AB2259 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 60317 of the Water Code, relating to water replenishment.
Title
Water replenishment: assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Assembly - AB 2259 RIDLEY-THOMAS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2259 Ridley-Thomas By Pavley (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2259 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2259 Ridley-Thomas By Pavley (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2259 RIDLEY-THOMAS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 736, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6239.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6244.). |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4607.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2014-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4590.) |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 60317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |