CA AB2282 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 432.3 and 1197.5 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Salary history information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2282 Eggman By Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2282 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2282 EGGMAN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 127, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5106.). |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5214.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1197.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 432.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |