CA AB2288 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2786.3 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Nursing programs: state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2288 Low Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2288 Low et al. By Caballero Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2288 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2288 Low et al. By Caballero Urgency Clause (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2288 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 282, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5339.). |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 4357.). |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-13 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-07-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4727.) |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2). |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2020-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2786.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |