CA AB2312 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12703.1 of, and to add Section 21608.7 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 11199.5) to Chapter 2 of Title 1 of Part 4 of the Penal Code, relating to metal theft.
Title
Metal theft.
Sponsors
Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] | Asm. Adam Gray [D] | Asm. Eric Linder [R] |
Asm. Jim Patterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 2312 NESTANDE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2312 Nestande By Berryhill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2312 NESTANDE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2312 Nestande By Berryhill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Assembly - AB 2312 NESTANDE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 608, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6089.). |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4409.). |
2014-08-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4850.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 12703.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21608.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21609 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 11199.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |