CA AB2313 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 515 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to agriculture.
Title
Farmer Equity Act of 2017: Regional Farmer Equipment and Cooperative Resources Assistance Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Bennett [D] | Asm. Dawn Addis [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] | Asm. Damon Connolly [D] |
Asm. Esmeralda Soria [D] | Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 515 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |