CA AB2325 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 28810 and 28811 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
San Francisco Bay Area Rapid Transit District: officers: designation and appointment.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 28810 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 28811 | Amended Code | Citation Text |