CA AB2330 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.6 (commencing with Section 2089.01) to Chapter 1.5 of Division 3 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Endangered species: incidental take: wildfire preparedness activities.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Dawn Addis [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2089.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |