CA AB2331 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3254.5 of the Government Code, relating to firefighters.
Title
Firefighters Procedural Bill of Rights Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2331 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2331 Skinner By Leno (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Special Consent #30 AB2331 Skinner (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 2331 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2331 Skinner By Leno (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-09 - Senate - Special Consent #30 AB2331 Skinner (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 2331 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 465, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-10 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2010-08-27 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6780.) | |
2010-08-25 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6644.) | |
2010-08-24 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-24 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4842.) | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-20 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2010-08-12 | Ordered returned to Senate. | |
2010-08-09 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4412.) | |
2010-08-04 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-29 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-06-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). | |
2010-06-03 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-05-27 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-05-26 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-05-13 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-04-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4943.) | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21). | |
2010-04-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7). | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |