CA AB2338 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1218 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts: contempt orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Assembly - AB 2338 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2020-06-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2020-06-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0.)
2020-05-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27).
2020-05-07AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-04AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
2020-03-17AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-02-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
2020-02-14AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure1218Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback