CA AB2352 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1302.5, 1800.3, 1836, 2356, 3211, 4672, 4673, 4674, 4676, 4677, 4679, 4695, 4696, 4698, 4701, 4731, 4740, 4742, 4750, 4800, 4802, 4803, 4804, 4805, and 4806 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 1 (commencing with Section 4670) of Part 2 of Division 4.7 of, and to add Section 4634 to, the Probate Code, and to amend Sections 391, 5008, 5150, 5346, 5350, 5354, 5585.20, 5971, 5977.3, 5980, 5981, 16501.1, and 21001 of, and to add Section 5845.6 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care decisions.
Title
Mental health and psychiatric advance directives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 23). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |