CA AB2375 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 25625 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Alcoholic beverages: on-sale general - eating place and on-sale general public premises: drink lids.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Josh Lowenthal [D] | Asm. Laurie Davies [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Tina McKinnor [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 3). |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25625 | New Code | See Bill Text |