CA AB2377 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 816, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 816, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.1 (commencing with Section 94157) to Chapter 2 of Part 59 of Division 10 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student loans, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Student loans: California Student Loan Refinancing
Sponsors
Asm. John Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 2377 PEREZ, J. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2377 John A. P (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2377 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2377 John A. P (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2377 PEREZ, J. Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 816, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 6521.). |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 4819.). |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 5272.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 94157 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 94200 | New Code | See Bill Text |