CA AB240 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2 and 3 of Chapter 188 of the Statutes of 1999, relating to conveyances.
Title
Conveyances: DeLaveaga Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-11 - Assembly - AB 240 MONNING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent #20 AB240 Monning By Simitian (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - AB 240 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent #20 AB240 Monning By Simitian (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-13 - Assembly - AB 240 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-03-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 422, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2009-09-11 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3351.) | |
2009-09-10 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-09-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2341.) | |
2009-09-08 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-09-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-31 | Ordered to third reading. | |
2009-08-26 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-20 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-19 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-07-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-07-08 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). | |
2009-06-15 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2009-04-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-04-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 821.) | |
2009-04-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-04-01 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 1). | |
2009-03-17 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |