CA AB240 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 92665) to Chapter 6 of Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to the University of California.
Title
University of California: California Institute for Aerospace.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-04-05 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2017-01-30 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 92665 | New Code | See Bill Text |