CA AB2401 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44124.5, 44125.5, and 44127 of, and to add Section 44128 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Clean Cars 4 All Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44124.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44125.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44128 | New Code | See Bill Text |