CA AB2422 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 900) to Division 1 of the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
Department of Financial Protection and Innovation: online resources: financial abuse: domestic violence victims.
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 900 | New Code | See Bill Text |