CA AB243 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-14 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 597.1 of, and to add Section 597.9 to, the Penal Code, relating to animal abuse.
Title
Animal abuse: penalties.
Sponsors
Asm. Tom Ammiano [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Dean Florez [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Asm. Pedro Nava [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-09-09 - Assembly - AB 243 NAVA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB243 Nava By Florez (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 243 NAVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB243 Nava By Florez (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Assembly - AB 243 NAVA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-14 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2009-10-26 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2009-10-11 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2009-09-28 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-09-09 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 3158.) | |
2009-09-08 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2009-09-03 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 2167.) | |
2009-08-31 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-27 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-08-19 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-08-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 17). | |
2009-07-16 | Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 25.) | |
2009-07-15 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). | |
2009-07-01 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-06-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-18 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 1925.) | |
2009-05-27 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-26 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2009-05-21 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 20). | |
2009-05-13 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-29 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 14). | |
2009-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-03-09 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2009-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 597.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |