CA AB2436 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-23 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS.
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10102 and 10103 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Residential property insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-08 - Assembly - AB 2436 Bloom Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 4678.) |
2020-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 7). |
2020-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |