CA AB2503 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21080.25 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: passenger rail projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |