CA AB2537 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24).
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24).
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 25993) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 80820 of the Water Code, relating to offshore wind energy development.
Title
Energy: offshore wind energy development: Offshore Wind Community Capacity Building Fund Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Utilities and Energy] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | (pending re-refer to Com. on U. & E.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 13.) |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & E. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25993 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 80820 | Amended Code | Citation Text |