CA AB2541 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 470, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 470, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 120130, 121022, and 121025 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health.
Title
Reporting of certain communicable diseases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-31 - Assembly - AB 2541 PORTANTINO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2541 Portantino By Emmerson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Senate - From Committee: Amendments returned to Senate floor for consideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2541 PORTANTINO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2541 Portantino By Emmerson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-25 - Senate - From Committee: Amendments returned to Senate floor for consideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 2541 PORTANTINO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 470, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-16 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2010-08-31 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6910.) | |
2010-08-30 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2010-08-30 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4996.) | |
2010-08-25 | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-08-23 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-08-20 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14). | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30). | |
2010-06-24 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-06-21 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-05-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5236.) | |
2010-05-17 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-13 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 12). | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-28 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-19 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4712.) | |
2010-04-14 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-04-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |