CA AB2542 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 72700) to Chapter 6 of Part 45 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: Accelerating Student Success College
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | In committee: Set second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |