CA AB2557 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 130060 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Hospitals: seismic safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] | Asm. Nora Campos [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Asm. Roger Dickinson [D] |
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Darrell Steinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Assembly - AB 2557 PAN Concurrence- Urgency Added (Y: 74 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB2557 Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2557 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB2557 Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - AB 2557 WILLIAMS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 821, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6745.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 4. Page 6753.). |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6732.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (August 29). |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on third reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4983.). |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Page 4952.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4952.) |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5112.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 130060 | Amended Code | Citation Text |