CA AB2562 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 909, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 909, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5091 of the Education Code, to amend Sections 100, 105, 2102, 2107, 9020, 9285, 14300, 17301, 17302, and 19202 of, and to repeal Section 10552 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2562 FONG Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2562 Fong By Padilla (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2562 FONG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2562 Fong By Padilla (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - Assembly - AB 2562 FONG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 909, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6347.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6357.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4698.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Padilla. |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4967.) |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 5091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 10552 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 11302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 17301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 17302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 19202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 2107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |