CA AB2565 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17586 to the Education Code, relating to school facilities.
Title
School facilities: interior locks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 17586 | New Code | See Bill Text |