CA AB2577 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 13004.2 to the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: taxes and contributions: aerospace industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 5 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-07 | In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to Com. on INS. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |