CA AB2581 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2811.5, 3524.5, 4980.54, 4989.34, 4996.22, and 4999.76 of, and to add Section 2914.4 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts: continuing education: maternal mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2811.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2914.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3524.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4980.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.76 | Amended Code | Citation Text |