CA AB2584 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 8 (commencing with Section 945.20) to Part 2 of Division 2 of the Civil Code, relating to real property.
Title
Single-family residential real property: corporate entity: ownership.
Sponsors
Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 9). |
2024-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 945.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |